Sea Venoms where were formally accepted into RAN service. 808 Squadron had reformed in the United Kingdom on 23 August 1955 and was the first RAN Squadron to be equipped ...
Fleet Air Arm
Australian Naval History on 23 August 1955
808 Squadron recommissioned at the Royal Navy Air Station (RNAS) Yeovilton in the south of England. Then equipped with de Havilland Sea Venoms, the Squadron participated in the RAN’s new ...
Australian Naval History on 15 August 1955
816 squadron recommissioned at RNAS Culdrose in Cornwall, England equipped with Fairey Gannet AS1s anti-submarine aircraft. ...
Australian Naval History on 1 June 1955
724 Squadron commissioned into the RAN at NAS Nowra as a fixed-wing conversion training unit with a variety of aircraft. (Was previously a RN Sqdn number). ...
Australian Naval History on 27 April 1955
Both 816 and 817 Squadron was decommissioned at Nowra as the Firefly was phased out of service and replaced by the Fairey Gannet ...
Australian Naval History on 5 October 1954
808 Squadron, flying Sea Furies, decommissioned at Nowra. ...
Australian Naval History on 3 August 1954
850 Squadron decommissioned and 851 Squadron commissioned at NAS Nowra as a training squadron flying Fairey Fireflies and Douglas Dakotas. ...
Australian Naval History on 18 June 1954
Delivery of the first RAN Vampire trainer took place when Lieutenant Peter Goldrick, RAN accepted the de Havilland Sea Vampire Mk T.34 at the de Havilland workshop in Bankstown on ...
Australian Naval History on 4 May 1954
850 and 805 Squadron tours in Korea ends. ...
Australian Naval History on 29 December 1953
850 Squadron pilot SBLT Michael Beardsall, RN, was killed when his Sea Fury crashed into the sea about 15 kilometres ahead of HMAS SYDNEY. ...